U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00498
  • Case Name: Matlock v. Redbird Business Group LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Exhibit List]
  • January 11, 2023: [Witness List]
  • January 11, 2023: [Docket]
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 09, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 03, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 02, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order]
  • September 01, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • August 25, 2022: [Leave]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • August 23, 2022: [Leave]
  • August 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 08, 2022: [Docket]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 19, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • July 15, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • July 15, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • July 15, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 07, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 17, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • June 17, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 17, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • June 17, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • June 17, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.