U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00500
  • Case Name: Burress v. Elliot et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 12, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
  • September 12, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 22, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 16, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 11, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • August 11, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 21, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 21, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order]
  • July 11, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 05, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Order]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • June 17, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • June 17, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.