U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00502
  • Case Name: Stillwater Designs and Audio Inc v. Googol Shop Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • October 03, 2022: [Administrative Closure]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 09, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • June 21, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • June 21, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 21, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • June 17, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.