U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00499
  • Case Name: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. EmployBridge of Dallas Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • January 03, 2023: [Docket]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • December 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 18, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • October 17, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 12, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • October 12, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 23, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 23, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 02, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 02, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 17, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.