U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00503
  • Case Name: Delgado v. NCB Management Services Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • September 07, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • September 07, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
  • September 02, 2022: [Docket]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • August 09, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • July 25, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • July 25, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 12, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • June 21, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • June 21, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.