U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00508
  • Case Name: Stephenson v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Social Security Response Brief]
  • January 03, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief]
  • November 03, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Order]
  • October 05, 2022: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • September 23, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
  • September 23, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 17, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • August 09, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Order]
  • June 21, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • June 21, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 21, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 21, 2022: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.