U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00507
  • Case Name: Miller v. Oklahoma Department of Human Services et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • January 13, 2023: [Expedite]
  • January 03, 2023: [Reply to Response to Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 23, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 09, 2022: [Entry of Default]
  • December 09, 2022: [Strike]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 06, 2022: [Extension of Time]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • November 10, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • July 26, 2022: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • July 26, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 22, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 15, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • July 15, 2022: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • July 15, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Receipt]
  • June 21, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • June 21, 2022: [Pro Se Litigant's Request for Issuance of Summons]
  • June 21, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.