U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00505
  • Case Name: Bamman et al v. United Services Automobile Association et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • September 02, 2022: [Docket]
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand to State Court]
  • August 10, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • August 02, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 20, 2022: [Remand to State Court]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 08, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • June 21, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 21, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • June 21, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • June 21, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • June 21, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.