U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00509
  • Case Name: Kriz et al v. City of Walters Oklahoma et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order]
  • January 17, 2023: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • November 16, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 14, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • September 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Order]
  • August 26, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • August 25, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • August 15, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Docket]
  • July 26, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 15, 2022: [Joint Status Report]
  • July 13, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 13, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Order]
  • June 27, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • June 27, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • June 21, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 21, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • June 21, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.