U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00513
  • Case Name: Terska et al v. Nestle Purina PetCare Co et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • December 06, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 06, 2022: [Stay Case]
  • December 01, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • November 22, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • November 22, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order for Response]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 15, 2022: [Strike]
  • November 15, 2022: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • November 04, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • September 20, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 19, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • September 16, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 08, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • August 29, 2022: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • July 05, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 22, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order for Response]
  • June 22, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • June 21, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • June 21, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.