U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00511
  • Case Name: Huff et al v. New Day Financial LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand to State Court]
  • August 05, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 22, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 22, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 01, 2022: [Remand to State Court]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 23, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • June 22, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order for Response]
  • June 21, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.