U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00504
  • Case Name: Nightengale v. Transamerica Life Insurance Co
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • December 30, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • October 04, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 19, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 13, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • September 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 07, 2022: [Docket]
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 18, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 18, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • June 22, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 21, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • June 21, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 21, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • June 21, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.