U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00518
  • Case Name: Cory v. Coterra Energy Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Reply]
  • August 02, 2022: [Reply]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 14, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • July 14, 2022: [Notice of Related or Companion Case]
  • July 14, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 22, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • June 22, 2022: [Pro Se Litigant's Request for Issuance of Summons]
  • June 22, 2022: [Receipt]
  • June 22, 2022: [Complaint]
  • June 22, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.