U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00516
  • Case Name: Granado et al v. Sandridge Energy Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 05, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 03, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • October 03, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 27, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 27, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 06, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 02, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 02, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 21, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • July 06, 2022: [Dismiss]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • June 28, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • June 24, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 23, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
  • June 23, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • June 22, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • June 22, 2022: [Notice of Filing Notice of Removal]
  • June 22, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.