U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00517
  • Case Name: Mayerhoefer v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand to Agency]
  • September 07, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Remand to Agency]
  • August 19, 2022: [Remand to Agency]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 22, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 22, 2022: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.