U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00515
  • Case Name: Curttright et al v. Scottsdale Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 02, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 01, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order]
  • September 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Leave]
  • August 30, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • August 08, 2022: [Docket]
July, 2022
  • July 01, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • July 01, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • June 23, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • June 23, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 23, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • June 22, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.