U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00512
  • Case Name: Smith v. Oklahoma County Detention Center
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • October 04, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order Declining Report and Recommendation]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • August 09, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • July 29, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • July 29, 2022: [Order]
  • July 19, 2022: [Receipt]
  • July 14, 2022: [Letter]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 22, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • June 22, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 22, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.