U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00519
  • Case Name: The Cigar Box LLC et al v. Houston Specialty Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 16, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 13, 2022: [Response to Motion]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 23, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • August 23, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • August 23, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 10, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 10, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 04, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • July 25, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • July 22, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 23, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • June 22, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 22, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.