U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00521
  • Case Name: Terry et al v. O'Connor et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Reply]
  • September 20, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 20, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 16, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 15, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • August 09, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 09, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • August 09, 2022: [File Excess Pages]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • July 14, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • July 14, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • June 29, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 28, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 27, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 23, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • June 23, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 23, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order for Response]
  • June 23, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • June 23, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.