U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00522
  • Case Name: Terry et al v. City of Oklahoma City Oklahoma et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 11, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • December 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 02, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 07, 2022: [Extension of Time]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • September 14, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 11, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • August 05, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • August 03, 2022: [Exhibit]
  • August 02, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • August 02, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • August 01, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • August 01, 2022: [File Excess Pages]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Strike]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • July 15, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 14, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • July 14, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 06, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 05, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 29, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • June 28, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 27, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • June 24, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • June 23, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 23, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • June 23, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • June 23, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.