U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00525
  • Case Name: Murphy v. Board of Trustees for the Oklahoma County Criminal Justice Authority et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Joint Status Report]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Report and Recommendation]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
  • December 14, 2022: [Entry of Default]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Proof of Service by Publication]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • October 12, 2022: [Affidavit]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Service by Publication]
  • September 14, 2022: [Service by Publication]
  • September 07, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • August 25, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • August 25, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • August 25, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 03, 2022: [Summons Issued]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • June 23, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.