U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00524
  • Case Name: Vinson v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 27, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 20, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 11, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 07, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • July 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • June 23, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • June 23, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • June 23, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 23, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.