U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00527
  • Case Name: Benshoof v. Hall et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Mail Returned]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
  • August 22, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
  • August 11, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • August 05, 2022: [Order]
  • August 05, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • July 29, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order]
  • July 19, 2022: [Clarify]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 08, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Order]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • June 24, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • June 24, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.