U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00529
  • Case Name: Jackson v. United of Omaha Life Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [ERISA Admin Record]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 18, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order]
  • October 03, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • September 07, 2022: [Docket]
  • September 01, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • July 21, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • June 30, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • June 27, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • June 24, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 24, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.