U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00536
  • Case Name: Hawkins v. CUNA Mutual Group
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Judgment]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • January 04, 2023: [ADR Report by Mediator / Evaluator]
  • January 04, 2023: [ADR Report by Parties]
December, 2022
  • December 26, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 23, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 21, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • December 19, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • December 14, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 12, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 12, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 09, 2022: [Continue]
  • December 09, 2022: [Docket]
  • December 08, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 08, 2022: [Objections]
  • December 08, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • December 06, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 06, 2022: [Leave]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order]
  • December 02, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • December 02, 2022: [Strike]
  • December 01, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • December 01, 2022: [In Limine]
  • December 01, 2022: [Strike]
  • December 01, 2022: [Trial Brief]
  • December 01, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • December 01, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • December 01, 2022: [Final Pretrial Report]
  • December 01, 2022: [Response to Non - Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [In Limine]
  • November 29, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • November 29, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • November 18, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • November 16, 2022: [Quash]
  • November 15, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • November 15, 2022: [Expedite]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 01, 2022: [Extension of Time]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • October 31, 2022: [Order]
  • October 28, 2022: [Witness List]
  • October 28, 2022: [Protective Order]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 02, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 01, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 31, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • August 12, 2022: [Docket]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 22, 2022: [Order]
  • July 21, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • July 21, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • July 21, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • July 21, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 15, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • June 27, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • June 27, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.