U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00535
  • Case Name: Locke et al v. Witt et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • January 20, 2023: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • January 20, 2023: [Third Party Complaint]
  • January 11, 2023: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 06, 2023: [Summons Issued]
  • January 06, 2023: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • November 23, 2022: [Leave]
  • November 23, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • November 18, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 20, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • October 12, 2022: [Docket]
  • October 05, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 04, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 04, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order]
  • October 04, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 04, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • October 03, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • October 03, 2022: [Leave]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Discovery]
  • September 29, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • September 26, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • September 15, 2022: [Docket]
  • September 14, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 01, 2022: [Response to Non - Motion]
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [Order]
  • August 02, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 02, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 01, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • July 21, 2022: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
  • July 21, 2022: [Third Party Complaint]
  • July 21, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 12, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 12, 2022: [Docket]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • June 27, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • June 27, 2022: [Third Party Complaint]
  • June 27, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 27, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • June 27, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.