U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00538
  • Case Name: Stokes v. Gold Productions Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Certificate of Service - NON SUMMONS]
  • January 23, 2023: [Default Judgment]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • December 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Entry of Default]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • June 28, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 28, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • June 27, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • June 27, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.