U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00537
  • Case Name: Judd et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Joint Status Report]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • December 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 02, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order]
  • September 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • August 30, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • August 25, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • August 24, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Docket]
  • July 19, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 07, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order]
  • July 05, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • July 05, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • June 28, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • June 28, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 28, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.