U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00539
  • Case Name: Bountwell v. Oklahoma County Board of Commissioners et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order]
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
  • August 08, 2022: [Receipt]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 22, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 22, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order]
  • June 28, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 28, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • June 28, 2022: [Complaint]
  • June 28, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.