U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00542
  • Case Name: Salazar v. Kohl's Department Stores Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Exhibit List]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Objections]
  • December 28, 2022: [Witness List]
  • December 28, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • December 15, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • December 15, 2022: [Witness List]
  • December 01, 2022: [Witness List - Expert]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 22, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order]
  • August 03, 2022: [Docket]
  • August 01, 2022: [Jury Demand]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • July 26, 2022: [Leave]
  • July 26, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 05, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • July 05, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • July 01, 2022: [Receipt]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • June 29, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 28, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.