U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00543
  • Case Name: Gaines v. Dowling
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 19, 2022: [Receipt]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • July 25, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • July 18, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order]
  • June 29, 2022: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • June 29, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • June 29, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.