U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00540
  • Case Name: Tamez v. Gonzalez et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Order]
  • December 02, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • November 22, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • November 22, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 18, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 10, 2022: [Receipt]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 17, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • October 17, 2022: [Letter]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 20, 2022: [Extension of Time]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 19, 2022: [Extension of Time]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Order]
  • July 18, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 13, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 08, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 29, 2022: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 29, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • June 29, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 29, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.