U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00545
  • Case Name: Wirtz, Jr. v. Farris
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Mail Returned]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • September 01, 2022: [Mail Returned]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • August 23, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • June 29, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • June 29, 2022: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.