U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00544
  • Case Name: Grigoryan v. Jones et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • August 03, 2022: [Docket]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 20, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • July 20, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • July 20, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.