U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00546
  • Case Name: Esquer-Davis v. Progressive Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • October 07, 2022: [Leave]
  • October 04, 2022: [Reply]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • September 20, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • September 14, 2022: [Leave]
  • September 14, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • September 13, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • September 12, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 09, 2022: [Notice of Related or Companion Case]
  • September 07, 2022: [Docket]
  • September 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 06, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • September 06, 2022: [Response to Motion]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • August 02, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • June 29, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • June 29, 2022: [Notice of Filing Notice of Removal]
  • June 29, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • June 29, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 29, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.