U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00551
  • Case Name: Cobb v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 11, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • October 28, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • October 28, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • September 13, 2022: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order]
  • September 08, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • September 08, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
  • September 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Complaint Social Security]
  • June 30, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.