U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00548
  • Case Name: McClure v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 11, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 24, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • October 24, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • October 24, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 11, 2022: [Reminder - General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • September 09, 2022: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order]
  • September 08, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • September 08, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
  • September 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • June 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 30, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 30, 2022: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.