U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00550
  • Case Name: Duerr v. Inframark LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • October 07, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • October 03, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • September 07, 2022: [Docket]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • July 18, 2022: [Leave]
  • July 18, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order]
  • July 12, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • July 06, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • July 06, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order]
  • June 30, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • June 30, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 30, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • June 30, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.