U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00549
  • Case Name: Brown et al v. Groendyke Transport Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Order]
  • January 20, 2023: [~Notice (other)]
  • January 11, 2023: [~Notice (other)]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 15, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 22, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 17, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 11, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Stay Case]
  • October 24, 2022: [Reply]
  • October 17, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • October 06, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order]
  • October 03, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan]
  • September 26, 2022: [Certify Class]
  • September 23, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • September 21, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 20, 2022: [Leave]
  • September 20, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 07, 2022: [Docket]
  • September 01, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
August, 2022
  • August 05, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • August 05, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • July 20, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • July 20, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 05, 2022: [Acknowledgment of Service]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • June 30, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • June 30, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.