U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00554
  • Case Name: Square v. Foxworth-Galbraith Lumber Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 22, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 22, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 21, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 21, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • November 07, 2022: [Docket]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • October 19, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 06, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 28, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 15, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
July, 2022
  • July 01, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • July 01, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.