U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00552
  • Case Name: Draper v. Midland Funding LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • August 29, 2022: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 01, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • August 01, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 01, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 14, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 01, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • July 01, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • July 01, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.