U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00555
  • Case Name: Greene et al v. United States Department of Justice et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Receipt]
  • September 12, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • August 30, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order]
  • August 22, 2022: [Receipt]
  • August 11, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Mandamus]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 22, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 21, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • July 12, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 01, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • July 01, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 01, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Mandamus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.