U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00558
  • Case Name: Baldridge v. Old Navy LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 03, 2023: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Docket]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Joint Status Report]
  • October 19, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Stay Case]
  • July 28, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • July 13, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • July 05, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • July 05, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • July 05, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 05, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • July 01, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 01, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.