U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00557
  • Case Name: Adrahtas v. Medicine Park Oklahoma Town of
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 15, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 11, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • November 11, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Docket]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • September 15, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • July 01, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • July 01, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.