U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00562
  • Case Name: Sasser v. GEO Lawton Correctional Rehabilitation Facility et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 08, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order]
  • August 01, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Order]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 05, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • July 05, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.