U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00563
  • Case Name: Guerrero v. Ted's Tow Llc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 22, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 18, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • July 07, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • July 06, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order for Response]
  • July 05, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • July 05, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.