U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00565
  • Case Name: Elmore v. David Stanley Ford of Midwest City LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 04, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 02, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • July 14, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • July 14, 2022: [Notice of Pending Motions]
  • July 12, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • July 12, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 06, 2022: [Receipt]
  • July 06, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • July 06, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 06, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.