U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00568
  • Case Name: Macias v. Love Beal & Nixon PC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • August 25, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 23, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 23, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 22, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 15, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • August 15, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 15, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 02, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • July 07, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • July 07, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.