U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00569
  • Case Name: Clinton HMA LLC v. Clinton Hospital Authority
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
April, 2025
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 02, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [~Notice (other)]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Order]
  • September 27, 2022: [~Util - Case Stayed]
  • September 27, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 27, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 26, 2022: [Stay Case]
  • September 26, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • September 07, 2022: [Docket]
  • September 02, 2022: [Answer to Counterclaim]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 18, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 03, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 02, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 28, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • July 28, 2022: [Counterclaim]
  • July 28, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 08, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • July 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 07, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • July 07, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • July 07, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.