U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00570
  • Case Name: McAfee v. United States of America et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Mail Returned]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • September 19, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • September 16, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 14, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order]
  • September 09, 2022: [Letter]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 15, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 12, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 11, 2022: [Letter]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order]
  • July 29, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 21, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 21, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 21, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 19, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 08, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • July 08, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.